-
the 7th Principal
Seo, Kyung-Ryeol
- School Anseong Agricultural High School
- Tenure Mar. 31, 1957 ~ Nov. 17, 1958
-
the 8th Principal
Hong, Rak-Sun
- School Anseong Agricultural High School
- Tenure Jan. 1, 1958 ~ Feb. 19, 1961
-
the 9th Principal
Song, Jae-Hyung
- School Anseong Agricultural High School
- School Anseong High Agricultural College
- Tenure Mar. 9, 1962 ~ Kul. 2, 1969
-
the 10th Principal
Han, Kyung-Woo
- School Anseong High Agricultural College
- School Anseong College of Agriculture
- Tenure Jul. 12, 1969 ~ Feb. 16, 1977
-
the 11th Principal
Kwak Sang-Man
- School Anseong College of Agriculture
- Tenure Feb. 17, 1977 ~ Mar. 24, 1977